A.S.A.P. - AIDS SUPPORT AWARENESS PROJECT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We make linguistically correct, culturally aware, health education DVD's which are shown to remote rural communities using portable DVD players by volunteer field workers whom we train. We aid former sex workers to seek an alternative life by helping them to start their own business. This is done via the donation of sewing machines, bicycles and wedding dresses that can then be rented or sold.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Windsor And Maidenhead
Governance
- 15 November 2006: Standard registration
- 24 February 2022: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- ASAP - AIDS SUPPORT AWARENESS (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2014 | 30/06/2016 | 30/06/2017 | 30/06/2018 | 30/06/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £400 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £550 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2019 | 03 September 2020 | 126 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2018 | 03 September 2020 | 492 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2018 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8 JUNE 2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 30 SEPTEMBER 2006. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07 SEP 2020
Charitable objects
(4.) THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE CHARITY IS ESTABLISHED FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY PEOPLE IN DEVELOPING COUNTRIES, ARE AS FOLLOWS (THE "OBJECTS"): (A) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH, PARTICULARLY RELATING TO HUMAN IMMUNODEFICIENCY VIRUS ("HIV) AND ACQUIRED IMMUNE DEFICIENCY SYNDROME ("AIDS"); AND (B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC ABOUT HIV AN AIDS, THEIR TRANSMISSION, PREVENTION AND CONSEQUENCES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window