LOURDES EX-STUDENTS ASSOCIATION UNITED KINGDOM (LESA UK)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance education, relieve sickness and poverty, preserve and protect the good health of people resident in Cameroon
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cameroon
- Ireland
Governance
- 24 September 2008: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bertha Andin Nwana | Chair | 17 April 2010 |
|
|
||||
Dr Montio Morgan | Trustee | 17 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
PAM NJAWE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MAMBAPFOUET CATHERINE NWANA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £795 | £1.09k | £384 | £1.13k | £275 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.50k | £3.00k | £0 | £45 | £4.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 06 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 02 October 2023 | 64 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 31 July 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 04 November 2021 | 97 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 21 October 2020 | 83 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14 SEPTEMBER 2008
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, RELIEVE SICKNESS AND POVERTY, PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE GOOD HEALTH OF PEOPLE RESIDENT IN CAMEROON.
Area of benefit
CAMEROON.
Contact information
- Address:
-
SUNNYSIDE
CROSSWAY
WALTON-ON-THAMES
KT12 3JA
- Phone:
- 07720077255
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window