SAM BEARE HOSPICE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of palliative and other appropriate care to persons suffering from a terminal and/or chronic illness within a hospice(s) or within the community with the object of improving the conditions of life for such persons. To relieve the emotional and mental needs of the patients, families, carers, staff and volunteers who assist in the care of patients.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
55 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Surrey
Governance
- 19 July 2006: Standard registration
- 25 April 2023: Funds received from 1062453 THE BUSENHART - MORGAN - EVANS FOUNDATION
- SAM BEARE HOSPICE WEYBRIDGE (Working name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ketan Amin | Trustee | 11 February 2025 |
|
|||||
Paula van Beurden | Trustee | 11 February 2025 |
|
|||||
Simon Moore | Trustee | 29 January 2025 |
|
|||||
NUWEED RAZAQ | Trustee | 29 January 2025 |
|
|||||
TIMOTHY ANDREW STOKES | Trustee | 01 March 2017 |
|
|||||
Roy Anthony Jarvis | Trustee | 01 March 2017 |
|
|||||
Jon Richard Jagger | Trustee | 01 March 2017 |
|
|||||
Richard Michael Roberts | Trustee | 01 March 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £72.00k | £327.93k | £102.56k | £769.64k | £172.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £72.00k | £327.93k | £102.56k | £769.64k | £172.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £763.67k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.17k | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £3.81k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £726.15k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £769.64k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.24k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £767.78k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 19/05/2006 AS AMENDED BY ORDER DATED 20/01/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 03/04/2014 as amended on 19 May 2022 as amended on 29 Jan 2025
Charitable objects
1) TO PROVIDE RELIEF BY PALLIATIVE AND OTHER APPROPRIATE CARE AND TREATMENT, AND SUPPORT, TO PERSONS SUFFERING FROM TERMINAL AND/OR CHRONIC ILLNESS AND/OR DISEASE AND/OR DISABILITY AND/OR BEREAVEMENT("THE PATIENTS") WITHIN A HOSPICE OR HOSPICES AND WITHIN THE COMMUNITY INCLUDING AT THE HOMES OF THE PATIENTS WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR SUCH PERSONS. 2) TO RELIEVE THE EMOTIONAL AND MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL NEEDS OF THE FAMILIES, CLOSE FRIENDS, CARERS, MEDICAL AND OTHER STAFF, PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE CARE OF THE PATIENTS, BY THE PROVISION OF CARE, ADVICE, SUPPORT AND COUNSELLING, INCLUDING BEREAVEMENT COUNSELLING AND ASSOCIATED SERVICES TO ANY AND/OR ALL SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE SURREY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Woking Hospice
The Goldsworth Park Centre
WOKING
GU21 3LG
- Phone:
- 01483881750
- Email:
- info@wsbh.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window