Financial history THE FOUNDATION FOR MOTHER AND CHILD HEALTH

Charity number: 1117795
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £7.58k £34.98k £5.82k £1.04k £1.55k
Total expenditure £9.53k £40.75k £5.93k £804 £1.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A