POLISH PARENTS' ASSOCIATION OF TADEUSZ KOSCIUSZKO POLISH SATURDAYSCHOOL IN EALING

Charity number: 1116993
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Teaching of Children aged 4-18 with the curriculum preparing for GCSE and A Level examinations; Fund raising in order to provide necessary environment and conditions for the above;

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £243,998
Total expenditure: £209,596

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Ealing

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 November 2006: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • POLISH PARENTS ASSOCIATION (Working name)
  • POLISH PARENTS' ASSOCIATION OF TADEUSZ KOSCIUSZKO POLISH SCHOOL IN EALING (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Agnieszka Jaslar Chair 22 November 2014
None on record
Anna Justkowska Trustee 21 November 2024
None on record
Sylwia Katarzyna Klocek Trustee 18 November 2023
None on record
Anna Marta Choroszczynska Trustee 17 May 2023
None on record
Pawel Daszynski Trustee 23 May 2022
None on record
Joanna Zbrzyzna Trustee 12 March 2022
None on record
Karolina Hernandez Trustee 22 January 2022
None on record
Iwona Szyszko Trustee 23 November 2019
None on record
KRYSTYNA LUKASIEWICZ Trustee 27 November 2013
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £230.56k £204.06k £153.40k £195.88k £244.00k
Total expenditure £176.53k £168.84k £164.56k £201.11k £209.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £6.62k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 30 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 30 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 11 November 2023 134 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 11 November 2023 134 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 30 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 30 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 26 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 26 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 27 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 27 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
School House
St. Gregorys Rc Primary School
Woodfield Road
LONDON
W5 1SL
Phone:
07973833216