FRIENDS OF ST ANDREWS' GREAT CORNARD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Organising fundraising activities to maintain and improve the buildings at St Andrews Church Great Cornard.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Suffolk
Governance
- 07 December 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PETER RICHARD HALDEN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Rev CHRISTOPHER JOHN RAMSEY | Trustee | 06 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £40 | £0 | £10.00k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.40k | £11.61k | £0 | £5.07k | £10.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 01 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 March 2022 | 137 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 November 2020 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 SEPTEMBER 2006 AS AMENDED 18 OCTOBER 2006
Charitable objects
THE FRIENDS OF ST ANDREW'S, GREAT CORNARD (HEREINAFTER REFERRED TO AS "THE FRIENDS") IS ESTABLISHED TO: "THE MAINTENANCE, REPAIR, RESTORATION, PRESERVATION, BEAUTIFICATION AND RECONSTRUCTION, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND WORSHIPPERS, THE FABRIC OF ST ANDREW'S GREAT CORNARD. ITS MONUMENTS, FIXTURES, FITTINGS, FURNITURE, STAINED GLASS, ORNAMENTS AND OTHER CHATTELS BELONGING TO THE CHURCH."
Area of benefit
ST ANDREW'S GREAT CORNARD
Contact information
- Address:
-
95 BURES ROAD
GREAT CORNARD
SUDBURY
CO10 0JE
- Phone:
- 01787376293
- Email:
- revchrisramsey@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window