Financial history WORLESTON AND DISTRICT VILLAGE HALL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1115499
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £35.15k £16.01k £16.24k £24.09k £24.09k
Total expenditure £38.94k £36.95k £36.00k £17.61k £16.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £11.37k N/A N/A N/A