THE COFFER FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide funds for the development of education and sport or medical research, particularly cancer research.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 23 January 2007: Standard registration
- RUTH AND DAVID COFFER CHARITABLE FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID COFFER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
CHERIE CLARK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JACQUELINE WRIGHT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RUTH COFFER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £100.00k | £372.50k | £20.00k | £140.00k | £192.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £99.83k | £273.05k | £110.44k | £127.69k | £212.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 May 2024 | 106 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 May 2024 | 106 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2020
(These accounts |
22 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 14 DECEMBER 2006 AS AMENDED 8 APRIL 2008
Charitable objects
A) TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE ART OF SCIENCE OF MUSIC, DANCING AND THE PERFORMING ARTS; B) TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE FIELDS OF PAINTING, DRAWING, ILLUSTRATION AND VISUAL ARTS; C) TO EDUCATE AND ASSIST YOUNG PERSONS THROUGH THEIR WORK OR LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES; D) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY AWARDING OR PROVIDING SCHOLARSHIPS, EXHIBITIONS, BURSARIES OR MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES TO ANY SCHOOL, UNIVERSITY OR OTHER EDUCATIONAL OR CHARITABLE ESTABLISHMENT APPROVED BY THE TRUSTEES OR TO PERSONS IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE; E) TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND ILL-HEALTH IN ALL THEIR FORMS AND THE CAUSES OF SUCH POVERTY AND ILL-HEALTH PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY FOR VICTIMS OF TERRORISM AND OTHER FORMS OF TRAUMA; F) TO PROTECT AND PRESERVE HEALTH BY PROVIDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO MEDIAL RESEARCH; G) TO RELIEVE HOMELESSNESS; H) TO FURTHER SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN ISRAEL AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS (ISRAEL)
Contact information
- Address:
-
DAVIS COFFER LYONS
52 PORTLAND PLACE
LONDON
W1B 1NH
- Phone:
- 02073300000
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window