MERIDIAN SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raising money to assist staff and pupils of Meridian School (Comberton) in enjoyment of education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 12 April 2007: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Veronica Margaret Hamilton | Trustee | 18 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Samuel David Waller | Trustee | 18 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Lawrence Easton | Trustee | 18 November 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.86k | £4.68k | £4.39k | £6.08k | £4.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.56k | £2.24k | £4.15k | £1.87k | £2.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 28 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 08 September 2023 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 22 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 24 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 02 September 2020 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 JANUARY 2006 AS AMENDED ON 02 NOV 2016 AS AMENDED ON 14 FEB 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: 1 DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; 2 ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, CAMBRIDGE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
MERIDIAN CP SCHOOL
HARBOUR AVENUE
COMBERTON
CAMBRIDGE
CB23 7DD
- Phone:
- 01223 262423
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window