Financial history BRITISH HORSE LOGGERS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1117426
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £320 £90 £50 £795 £50
Total expenditure £1.11k £873 £3.74k £4.36k £1.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A