BRITISH HORSE LOGGERS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PROMOTE AND MAINTAIN THE STANDARDS OF THE CRAFT OF HORSE LOGGING FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN THE CRAFT OF HORSE LOGGING AND ASSOCIATED SKILLS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 02 January 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kate Mobbs-Morgan | Trustee | 07 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Schaffler | Trustee | 01 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Geraint Richards | Trustee | 07 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
JULIAN TYNDALE PHILIPSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £320 | £90 | £50 | £795 | £50 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.11k | £873 | £3.74k | £4.36k | £1.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 11 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 05 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24/04/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02/12/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/12/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/10/2012
Charitable objects
3.1) TO PROMOTE AND MAINTAIN THE STANDARDS OF THE CRAFT OF HORSE LOGGING FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT; AND 3.2) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN THE CRAFT OF HORSE LOGGING AND ASSOCIATED SKILLS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
PRIORY FARM
HOLYSTONE
MORPETH
NE65 7AJ
- Phone:
- 0123456
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window