LOWE HOUSE ST HELENS BOXING CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The club is a boys and girls club in St Helens that provides boxing training to A.B.A standard and keep fit for the local commumity. It is open 5 night a week ?4 per week for juniors and ?6 a week for adults
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- St Helens
Governance
- 10 October 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KEVIN BACON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Lee Thomas Bacon | Trustee | 13 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Lee | Trustee | 13 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Graham Lee | Trustee | 13 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Bacon | Trustee | 31 October 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.62k | £3.68k | £16.36k | £5.70k | £8.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.15k | £4.11k | £14.92k | £5.99k | £7.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 MARCH 2006 AS AMENDED AT A SPECIAL MEETING DATED 22 AUGUST 2006.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR AMATEUR BOXING AND OTHER ACTIVITIES CAPABLE OF IMPROVING PHYSICAL HEALTH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Helens Boxing Club
Halefield Street
St. Helens
WA10 2DE
- Phone:
- 01744635720
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window