Financial history THE ANTHONY WALKER FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1117769
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £125.29k £509.67k £256.26k £320.46k £464.92k
Total expenditure £85.64k £293.86k £386.68k £311.77k £432.39k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £132.10k £86.20k
Income from government grants £46.67k £320.91k N/A N/A £66.18k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £87.14k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A £166 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A £422.35k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment N/A £9 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £293.86k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £1.51k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A