THE ANTHONY WALKER FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote racial harmony for the benefit of the public by: (a) Raising awareness of equal opportunities, diversity, and citizenship, in particular but not exclusively through the provision of information, materials, and training. (b) Providing or assisting in the provision of facilities in the interests of social welfare for recreation, or other leisure time occupation of individuals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income includes £86,200 from 2 government contract(s) and £66,180 from 2 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Halton
- Knowsley
- Liverpool City
- Sefton
- St Helens
- Wirral
Governance
- 31 January 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN DENNY | Trustee | 22 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Mark Jason Pennifold | Trustee | 22 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Martin | Trustee | 12 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jannine Louise Anthigha | Trustee | 11 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
DOMINIQUE WALKER | Trustee | 10 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
STEPHANIE WALKER BA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr MARTIN LAURENCE CAREY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAUL BADEN PARRY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DR RICHARD BENJAMIN PHD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £125.29k | £509.67k | £256.26k | £320.46k | £464.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £85.64k | £293.86k | £386.68k | £311.77k | £432.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £132.10k | £86.20k | |
|
Income from government grants | £46.67k | £320.91k | N/A | N/A | £66.18k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £87.14k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £166 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £422.35k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £9 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £293.86k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £1.51k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 28 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 28 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 28 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 28 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 25 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 25 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 29 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 29 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 11 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 11 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20/01/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/12/2013
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE RACIAL HARMONY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY: 1. RAISING AWARENESS OF EQUAL OPPORTUNITIES, DIVERSITY AND CITIZENSHIP, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION, EDUCATIONAL MATERIALS, RESOURCES AND TRAINING; 2. PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE LIVERPOOL,KNOWSLEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
LCVS
151 Dale Street
LIVERPOOL
L2 2AH
- Phone:
- 01512373974
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window