Financial history SAFER BIRTH IN CHAD FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1115489
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2015 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019
Total gross income £1.47k £481 £951 £160 £120
Total expenditure £1.70k £3.23k £135 £851 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A