Accounts and annual returns TINDERBOX PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1116227
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2016 24 February 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2015 05 January 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2014 19 January 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2014 19 January 2015 On Time