Financial history COMPLETE COFFEE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1115529
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018
Total gross income £3.00k £6.00k £2.50k £2.50k £2.50k
Total expenditure £4.00k £4.17k £4.06k £66 £1.82k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A