Financial history HOPE UNLIMITED (WEST MIDLANDS)

Charity Number: 1116732
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2010 30/04/2011 30/04/2012 30/04/2013 30/04/2014
Total gross income £6.28k £9.38k £55.57k £134.30k £241.15k
Total expenditure £13.62k £15.66k £15.94k £102.96k £286.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A