CIBSE BENEVOLENT FUND TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS AND WHO ARE MEMBERS OR FORMER MEMBERS OF THE INSTITUTION OF HEATING AND VENTILATING ENGINEERS OR OF THE ILLUMINATING ENGINEERING SOCIETY OF GREAT BRITAIN OR THE CHARTERED INSTITUTION OF BUILDING SERVICE ENGINEERS AND THE IMMEDIATE DEPENDANTS OF SUCH PERSONS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Australia
- Ireland
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 21 August 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kevin Kelly | Chair | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Leslie Darron Copeland | Trustee | 12 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Lionel James | Trustee | 22 May 2024 |
|
|||||
John Sproxton | Trustee | 22 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
RAY GOODING | Trustee | 22 June 2022 |
|
|||||
John Field FCIBSE | Trustee | 05 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alan John McWilliam MCIBSE | Trustee | 25 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mr Ken Beecroft | Trustee | 25 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
John McLean FCIBSE | Trustee | 19 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
James Alfred Stocker MCIBSE | Trustee | 09 October 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £62.17k | £58.19k | £51.41k | £50.72k | £64.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £49.17k | £43.41k | £47.96k | £63.10k | £57.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 06 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 06 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 June 2024 | 219 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 06 June 2024 | 219 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 01 November 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 06 June 2024 | 584 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 16 AUGUST 2005
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS AND WHO ARE MEMBERS OR FORMER MEMBERS OF THE INSTITUTION OF HEATING AND VENTILATING ENGINEERS OR OF THE ILLUMINATING ENGINEERING SOCIETY OF GREAT BRITAIN OR OF THE CHARTERED INSTITUTION OF BUILDING SERVICES ENGINEERS AND THE IMMEDIATE DEPENDANTS OF SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
CIBSE Benevolent Fund
91-94 Saffron Hill
LONDON
EC1N 8QP
- Phone:
- 02086755211
- Email:
- benfund@cibse.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window