RETFORD BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the christian faith both locally and worldwide and as an expression of christian love to relieve sickness and financial hardship, to promote and preserve good health and to advance education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 21 May 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Mark Armstrong | Trustee | 24 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Anuli Udeze | Trustee | 10 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Peter James Everitt | Trustee | 14 February 2022 |
|
|||||
Frank Woolrich | Trustee | 24 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Austin Gray | Trustee | 22 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
YVONNE EVELYN WARREN | Trustee | 01 April 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £338.33k | £338.33k | £311.63k | £279.80k | £327.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £355.51k | £355.51k | £287.68k | £308.29k | £315.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 24 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 24 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 18 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 June 2022
(These accounts |
18 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 28 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 28 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 20 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 20 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 12 APRIL 2007
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE BASIS OF FAITH IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT, AND AS AN EXPRESSION OF CHRISTIAN LOVE 1 TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS, GOODS OR SERVICES OF ANY KIND, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; AND 2 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT
Area of benefit
THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE WELL
HOSPITAL ROAD
RETFORD
DN22 7BD
- Phone:
- 01777 702344
- Email:
- admin@thewellrbc.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window