SCHOOL AID INDIA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
supporting a school for disadvantaged children in Darjeeling
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- India
Governance
- 13 November 2006: Standard registration
- 18 August 2023: Funds received from 327720 THE JESUIT NEVETT FUND FOR CHILDREN
- SAI (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Balfour | Chair | 01 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
David Jones | Trustee | 18 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
MRS IRENE HEATHER WOODALL | Trustee | 12 December 2006 |
|
|
||||
HELEN RUTH JONES | Trustee | 12 December 2006 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT WILLIAM GOODBURN JONES | Trustee | 12 December 2006 |
|
|
||||
SARAH SANSOM | Trustee | 12 December 2006 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.97k | £4.32k | £10.58k | £13.14k | £23.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.16k | £4.06k | £11.94k | £11.99k | £8.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 25 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 27 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 11 January 2023 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 25 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 12 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 13 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION DATED 19 JULY 2006 AS AMENDED ON 16 OCTOBER 2006
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND ENHANCE EDUCATIONAL OPPORTUNITIES FOR DISADVANTAGED CHILDREN RESIDENT IN INDIA, WITHOUT RESTRICTING THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING, PARTICULARLY IN THE DISTRICT OF DARJEELING.
Area of benefit
INDIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 SUNNYFIELD
GREAT AYTON
MIDDLESBROUGH
TS9 6NT
- Phone:
- 01642723357
- Email:
- helen.r.jones@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window