Accounts and annual returns GREAT WILBRAHAM PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1116632
Charity reporting is up to date (52 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 November 2023 23 October 2024 52 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 November 2023 Not Required
Annual return 01 November 2022 07 November 2023 67 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 November 2022 Not Required
Annual return 01 November 2021 12 October 2022 41 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 November 2021 Not Required
Annual return 01 November 2020 31 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 November 2020 Not Required
Annual return 01 November 2019 20 October 2020 49 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 November 2019 Not Required