MANCHESTER CHAMBER CONCERTS SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To educate the public in the arts and sciences, and in particular the art and science of music, by the presentation of concerts and other activities. This is mainly achieved by presenting annually a series of concerts of chamber music at the Royal Northern College of Music in Manchester at which ensembles of international stature perform.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Manchester City
Governance
- 26 July 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Moore Kyle | Trustee | 13 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Isabel Barbara Morris | Trustee | 13 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Vivien Chasey | Trustee | 04 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
JANIS STOUT | Trustee | 05 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
GORDON LEVY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36.22k | £4.14k | £37.28k | £23.21k | £28.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £46.13k | £16.32k | £52.74k | £56.83k | £52.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 11 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 11 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 08 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 01 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 01 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 21 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 30 JUNE 2006
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS AND SCIENCES, AND IN PARTICULAR THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC , BY THE PRESENTATION OF CONCERTS AND OTHER ACTIVITIES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED BY GI. IN PRACTICE, GREATER MANCHESTER, YORKSHIRE AND CHESHIRE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Suite 5
4th Floor
3 Universal Square
Devonshire Street North
Manchester
- Phone:
- 01617132594
- Email:
- info@chamberconcerts.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window