AID AFRICA (OPEN HAND PROJECTS)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Emergency maize distributed Community agri-gardens maintained Goat herd established and bred for milk feeding programme Houses and roofs repaired for the most vulnerable Water bore holes repaired Land purchased and erection of offices, living quarters, storerooms, training hall, livestock houses and security wall started. Training in agriculture
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Malawi
Governance
- 10 October 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID MILLS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Hilda Stoker | Trustee | 15 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER PALMER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LYNDA MILLS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £61.39k | £73.24k | £73.07k | £127.34k | £47.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £67.28k | £50.37k | £58.90k | £94.27k | £87.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £22.38k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 08 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 08 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 06 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 06 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 18 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 18 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 24 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 24 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 01 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 01 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 15 SEPTEMBER 2006
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND SICKNESS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN MALAWI BY SUPPLYING RESOURCES AND ADVICE FOR AGRICULTURAL PROJECTS
Area of benefit
MALAWI
Contact information
- Address:
-
Aid Africa
PO Box 103
Fakenham
NR21 1BF
- Phone:
- 07726939300
- Email:
- info@aid-africa.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window