Financial history BLESSING FAMILY ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1118767
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £54.08k £10.25k £19.99k £24.29k £31.00k
Total expenditure £48.21k £9.95k £16.12k £18.33k £28.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A