Financial history THE WINGS MUSEUM LIMITED

Charity Number: 1117879
Charity reporting is up to date (19 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £56.86k £154.65k £307.56k £102.87k £109.52k
Total expenditure £66.60k £46.18k £52.07k £62.15k £79.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £27.00k £22.86k N/A N/A