THE OASIS CENTRE COMMUNITY PROJECT - EAST MANCHESTER
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Oasis Centre is a day centre for vulnerable and marginalised people offering 4 support programmes helping clients become stable, re-engaged and inspired for their future. 1. RE-BUILD: Free Cafe, Emergency Provision, Community Support and a Charity Shop. 2. RE-ENGAGE: Community based activities.3.RE-SKILL: Teaching basic life skills 4. RE-START: Helping clients find work and contribute
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Manchester City
Governance
- 21 August 2006: Standard registration
- 14 September 2019: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 14 September 2019: Funds transferred to 1166834 THE OASIS CENTRE COMMUNITY PROJECT-EAST MANCHESTER
No other names
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2014 | 31/08/2015 | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £86.85k | £164.58k | £135.51k | £331.40k | £53.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £84.91k | £118.73k | £118.18k | £144.22k | £364.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £950 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2018 | 27 June 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2018 | 27 June 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2017 | 13 June 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2017 | 13 June 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2016 | 28 February 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2016 | 28 February 2017 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 24 MAY 2006
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF GORTON AND THE SURROUNDING EAST MANCHESTER AREA THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR LIFE-SKILLS EMPOWERMENT, RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
GORTON AND THE SURROUNDING EAST MANCHESTER AREA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window