Financial history IMAM REZA CULTURALCENTRE LIMITED

Charity number: 1116327
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £24.14k £21.80k £31.41k £16.05k £25.82k
Total expenditure £23.19k £21.01k £18.33k £23.36k £26.22k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k £19.74k N/A N/A