Project Gateway UK Trust

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Giving grants to Project Gateway in Pietermaritzburg, South Africa for education, food and clothing for vulnerable young people, support for abused women and their children and training/materials for empowerment programmes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- South Africa
Governance
- 14 February 2007: Standard registration
- Project Gateway UK Trust (Working name)
- PCF GATEWAY TRUST (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sally Wood | Chair | 03 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Esther Hagar Zarifi | Trustee | 23 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Trevor Scott Nixon | Trustee | 03 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Reginald Edward Witchard | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Andrew James Morrish | Trustee |
|
||||||
Roger Charles Maxwell | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £38.17k | £33.71k | £36.82k | £34.83k | £42.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.57k | £32.06k | £38.87k | £39.00k | £37.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 02 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 03 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 10 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 10 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 21 JANUARY 2007. as amended on 12 Dec 2022
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UP TO THE AGE OF 17 IN SOUTH AFRICA, IN PARTICULAR BY SUPPORTING GATEWAY CHRISTIAN SCHOOL, AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DECIDE AND IS RECOGNISED AS CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE CHARITABLE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES. THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH, THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONG PEOPLE RESIDING IN KWAZULU, NATAL IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO THE NON-PROFIT MAKING ORGANISATION PROJECT GATEWAY, AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DECIDE AND IS RECOGNISED AS CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE CHARITABLE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES.
Area of benefit
GATEWAY CHRISTIAN SCHOOL, SOUTH AFRICA AND KWAZULU, NATAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 Oakey Drive
Wokingham
Berkshire
RG40 2DT
- Phone:
- 07725 566485
- Email:
- pguktrust@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window