END TIME AMBASSADORS INTERNATIONAL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of safe accomodation and schools for orphan children.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ghana
Governance
- 14 September 2006: Standard registration
- 18 January 2011: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- CONVOY OF HOPE (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2007 | 31/07/2008 | |
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2009 | 31 August 2010 | 92 days late | |
Annual return | 31 July 2008 | 13 March 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2008 | 24 June 2009 | 24 days late | |
Annual return | 31 July 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2007 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 21 JULY 2006 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME 20 NOVEMBER 2008
Charitable objects
A) TO RELIEVE POVERTY, DISTRESS AND SUFFERING OF PEOPLE THROUGHOUT THE WORLD AND TO MAKE DONATIONS OR GRANTS TO ASSIST PEOPLE; B) TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC CONCERNING THE SOCIAL, POLITICAL, ECONOMIC AND OTHER PROBLEMS THAT CONFRONT DISADVANTAGED PEOPLE; C) TO PROVIDE HUMANITARIAN AND OTHER ESSENTIAL AID TO ASSIST IN RELIEVING THE POVERTY, SICKNESS AND SUFFERING OF PEOPLE THROUGHOUT THE WORLD, IN PARTICULAR FOOD, MEDICAL AND OTHER SIMILAR AIDE TO ASSIST IN RELIEVING SICKNESS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window