MOUNT ST MARY'S

Charity number: 1117998
Charity reporting is up to date (12 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Trust operates two co-educational independent schools: Mount St Mary's College (11 to 18 years) and Barlborough Hall School (3 to 11 years).

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Derbyshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 February 2007: Standard registration
  • 11 January 2023: Funds received from 275497 THE MOUNT ST MARY'S CHARITABLE FUND
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David Holliday Trustee 01 January 2024
None on record
Joe Forth Trustee 01 January 2024
None on record
Rev Christopher Pedley Trustee 17 March 2023
None on record
Rev Dermot Preston Trustee 16 March 2023
None on record
Shaun Whyman Trustee 01 December 2022
None on record
Antony Hind Trustee 01 December 2022
None on record
Matthew Wilson Trustee 04 October 2021
None on record
Hardip Nijjar Trustee 30 September 2019
BC FOUNDATION
Received: 33 days late
Sara Clarkson Trustee 30 September 2019
None on record
Rev Simon David Ellis Trustee 27 June 2018
None on record
Michael Burrowes Trustee 20 June 2018
None on record
Ian Murphy Trustee 01 September 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £7.59m £7.17m £6.23m £6.83m £7.45m
Total expenditure £7.99m £12.06m £7.64m £7.81m £7.88m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £82.06k £359.91k £235.90k £43.92k £29.79k
Income - Other trading activities £481.07k £238.16k £206.30k £304.69k £43.88k
Income - Charitable activities £6.88m £5.83m £5.57m £6.40m £7.30m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £113.08k £101.79k £91.67k £59.08k £53.23k
Income - Other £29.76k £636.11k £128.63k £23.47k £24.75k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £7.50m £11.60m £7.21m £7.37m £7.38m
Expenditure - Raising funds £490.99k £457.74k £437.16k £440.08k £504.79k
Expenditure - Governance £46.47k £50.37k £115.52k £86.36k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £9.71k £8.75k £3.53k £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Own use assets £12.51m £9.93m £8.90m £8.36m £8.06m
Long-term investments £1.45m £1.30m £1.12m £12.29k £12.29k
Other assets £1.20m £890.28k £978.57k £797.69k £1.35m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £5.35m £6.16m £6.25m £5.40m £6.17m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 12 July 2024 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 12 July 2024 12 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 23 August 2023 54 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 23 August 2023 54 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 20 December 2022 173 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 20 December 2022 173 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 30 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 30 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 01 September 2020 63 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 01 September 2020 63 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Mount St Mary's College
Spinkhill
Derbyshire
S21 3YL
Phone:
01246433388