Accounts and annual returns SUDBURY TOWN AREA RURAL TRANSPORT (START)

Charity Number: 1118101
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2011 27 October 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2010 03 November 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 08 November 2010 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2009 12 October 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 04 November 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2008 22 October 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 13 October 2008 On Time