The Friends of Reedings Junior School and Fawbert and Barnard Infants School

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
RUN PTA EVENTS TO RAISE MONEY FOR F&B INFANTS SCHOOL, SAWBRIDGEWORTH
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Other Finance
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 25 October 2006: Standard registration
- 12 January 2023: Funds received from 1097337 FRIENDS OF REEDINGS JUNIOR SCHOOL
- THE FRIENDS OF FAWBERT & BARNARD INFANTS SCHOOL (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charlotte Eileen Painter | Trustee | 03 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Clare Crowhurst | Trustee | 08 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Craig | Trustee | 08 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alice Natalie Frost | Trustee | 08 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert Dominic Lamprell | Trustee | 08 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lindsey Hughes | Trustee | 08 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Dumphreys | Trustee | 06 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Vicki Marie Bramley | Trustee | 07 October 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.52k | £10.66k | £15.97k | £22.28k | £22.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.12k | £4.46k | £5.50k | £7.57k | £6.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 02 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 14 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 24 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 06 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 06 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 JULY 2006 as amended on 08 Nov 2022 as amended on 08 Nov 2022
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY:- 1) DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL 2) ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE SAWBRIDGEWORTH
Contact information
- Address:
-
Fawbert & Barnard Infants School
Knight Street
SAWBRIDGEWORTH
CM21 9AT
- Phone:
- 01279 722357
- Email:
- fabpta@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window