BASQUE CHILDREN OF '37 ASSOCIATION UK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our association aims to inform on the exile of 4000 children to UK during the Spanish Civil War by; giving and arranging talks and exhibitions, disseminating information via our webpage. We are involved in erecting Blue Plaques at colony sites, are actively engaged in collecting archive material and help research relevant to the topic.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Oxfordshire
- Surrey
Governance
- 25 August 2006: Standard registration
- 17 January 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2012 | 30/11/2013 | 30/11/2014 | 30/11/2015 | 30/11/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.32k | £1.55k | £977 | £1.16k | £1.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.69k | £3.65k | £1.89k | £2.67k | £1.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 December 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 December 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2016 | 05 September 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2015 | 09 May 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2014 | 07 August 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2014 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 JULY 2006
Charitable objects
1)TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SUBJECT OF THE EXILE IN 1937 OF 4000 BASQUE CHILDREN TO THE UK DURING THE SPANISH CIVIL WAR 2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF STUDENTS AND ACADEMICS IN THE SUBJECT OF THE EXILE IN 1937 OF 4000 BASQUE CHILDREN TO THE UK DURING THE SPANISH CIVIL WAR
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window