EUROPEAN LUNG FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The European Lung Foundation provides information on lung health and disease for patients the general public, business and the media.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
290 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£110k to £120k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
- Australia
- Belgium
- Czech Republic
- Denmark
- France
- Germany
- Greece
- Hungary
- Ireland
- Italy
- Luxembourg
- Netherlands
- Norway
- Portugal
- South Africa
- Spain
- Switzerland
- United States
Governance
- 24 April 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dimitris Kontopidis | Trustee | 20 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Judith Garcia Aymerich | Trustee | 04 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Werner Bill | Trustee | 25 November 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £962.79k | £662.74k | £523.22k | £527.66k | £379.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £612.02k | £630.65k | £527.50k | £729.88k | £687.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £195.79k | £17.32k | £20.29k | £49.38k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £677 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £766.32k | £645.42k | £502.93k | £478.28k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £612.02k | £630.65k | £527.50k | £729.88k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £1.60k | £1.65k | £1.80k | £2.00k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £2.86k | £0 | £34.42k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 22 FEBRUARY 2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 11 JANUARY 2007.
Charitable objects
3. THE COMPANY'S OBJECTS ARE: (I) TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF SUFFERERS OF LUNG DISEASE AND ITS RELATED RISKS, PRIMARILY IN EUROPE; (II) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND UNDERSTANDING OF THE PUBLIC ABOUT LUNG DISEASE AND ITS RELATED RISK FACTORS; (III) TO PROMOTE RESEARCH INTO LUNG DISEASE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
PRIMARILY IN EUROPE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
442 GLOSSOP ROAD
SHEFFIELD
S10 2PX
- Phone:
- 01142672874
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window