Trustees ENGLISH PEN
Charity number: 1125610

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ruth Borthwick | Chair | 19 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dina Nayeri | Trustee | 30 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Jill Southcombe Parker | Trustee | 30 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rachael Elizabeth Davis-Featherstone | Trustee | 30 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Beresford-Knox | Trustee | 25 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Akhio Schilz | Trustee | 19 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Stocks | Trustee | 22 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Vedat Can Yeginsu | Trustee | 26 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ted Hodgkinson | Trustee | 23 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Milena Buyum | Trustee | 23 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Guy Marasinghe Lindvall Gunaratne | Trustee | 23 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Georgina Godwin | Trustee | 25 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Miller | Trustee | 01 October 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.