FIREBIRD THEATRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Firebird Theatre is a company of disabled performers. Its main activities include: making and performing exciting and innovative theatre; touring; devising and delivering workshops/presentations/ performances to young disabled and non-disabled people, teachers and professionals; showing its work to as many people as possible; supporting other disabled people to be involved in theatre.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bristol City
Governance
- 02 August 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Melanie Scaffold | Chair | 13 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Sabrina Sallis | Trustee | 18 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Antigoni Messaritaki | Trustee | 07 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
JOANNA PENELOPE CUTHBERT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.19k | £3.38k | £5.62k | £876 | £1.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.86k | £4.18k | £3.33k | £4.45k | £5.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 21 June 2024 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 15 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 07 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 17 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 27 November 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 2 MARCH 2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 3 MARCH 2010
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE PROMOTION OF THE ARTS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THE ART OF DRAMA
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED BY GI. IN PRACTICE, BRISTOL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
195-197 Whiteladies Road
BRISTOL
BS8 2SB
- Phone:
- 01173730873
- Email:
- info@firebird-theatre.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window