Manzini Youth Care UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fund raising in order to achieve the charity's aims aims of educating and relieving poverty of the underprivileged in Manzini, Swaziland.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Eswatini
Governance
- 19 October 2006: Standard registration
- MANZINI YOUTH CARE (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Margaret Parsons | Chair | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ian George Parsons | Trustee | 05 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Doreen Janet Smith | Trustee | 12 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Karen Louise Tait | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|||||
Pauline Anne Marie Wooler | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Ann Whittaker | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
MOIRA DENISE MILLER | Trustee | 25 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE O'NEILL | Trustee | 25 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
ANN LAYDON | Trustee | 30 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
TERESA WHITTAKER | Trustee | 30 January 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.88k | £2.94k | £1.39k | £2.17k | £4.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.04k | £1.03k | £2.33k | £2.03k | £3.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 03 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 03 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION DATED 13 JULY 2006 AS AMENDED 27 JULY 2006 as amended on 26 Sep 2018 as amended on 30 Jun 2022 as amended on 08 Aug 2024
Charitable objects
1. To advance the education of disadvantaged and/or vulnerable children and young people in Eswatini 2. To promote the health and wellbeing of disadvantaged and/or vulnerable children and young people in Eswatini 3. To contribute to the relief of poverty in relation to children and young people in Eswatini
Area of benefit
MANZINI, SWAZILAND, SOUTHERN AFRICA
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Western Avenue
Prudhoe
Northumberland
NE42 6NU
- Phone:
- 07968 776718
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window