WREXHAM U3A

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General and Interest Group meetings to facilitate learning and excercise for older people to remain active in their retirement.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Human Resources
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Wrexham
Governance
- 04 August 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Val Hughes | Trustee | 18 March 2025 |
|
|
||||||||
Sue Holland | Trustee | 18 March 2025 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr Zarina Kagan | Trustee | 19 March 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Anne Hughes | Trustee | 19 March 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Jane Dutton | Trustee | 19 March 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
GWYNETH MARY HUGHES | Trustee | 21 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Lynn Jones | Trustee | 08 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Alan John Sutton | Trustee | 22 March 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr Stanley Victor Moore | Trustee | 03 April 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.71k | £5.93k | £5.60k | £5.57k | £5.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.53k | £6.29k | £4.42k | £4.55k | £4.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 November 2021 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 18 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 09/03/2006 AS AMENDED ON 18/03/2014 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 12 JUL 2018 as amended on 17 May 2021
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK, BY ALL MEANS INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT.
Area of benefit
WREXHAM AND SURROUNDING LOCALITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 GREYSTONES
FOSTER ROAD
WREXHAM
LL11 2SE
- Phone:
- 01978291590
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window