Financial history PLESHEY CHURCH BUILDING TRUST

Charity number: 1115685
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £989 £1.29k £674 £736 £3.56k
Total expenditure £0 £7.40k £2.00k £0 £12.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A