ISHTIAQ AND NAGHMA LATIF FOUNDATION CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the charity per the trust deed are to aid and educate the under privelaged in third world countries, especially in helping widows and orphans. The trustees can also apply the income to any other charitable purpose they see fit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Pakistan
Governance
- 28 September 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Amir Ishtiaq Latif | Trustee | 18 March 2016 |
|
|||||
FARRAH LATIF | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MISS SEEMA LATIF | Trustee |
|
||||||
NAZIA ISHTIAQ LATIF | Trustee |
|
||||||
KASHIF ISHTIAQ LATIF | Trustee |
|
||||||
MR ISHTIAQ LATIF | Trustee |
|
||||||
MISS AAISHA LATIF | Trustee |
|
||||||
NAGHMA ISHTIAQ LATIF | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.54k | £374 | £6.32k | £1.70k | £43 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 28 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 24 June 2024 | 55 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 15 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 01 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 12 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 15 SEPTEMBER 2006
Charitable objects
TO AID AND EDUCATE THE UNDER PRIVILEGED IN THIRD WORLD COUNTRIES, ESPECIALLY IN HELPING WIDOWS AND ORPHANS. THE TRUSTEES CAN ALSO APPLY THE INCOME TO ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE THEY SEE FIT.
Area of benefit
THIRD WORLD COUNTRIES
Contact information
- Address:
-
65 WESTFIELD ROAD
EDGBASTON
BIRMINGHAM
B15 3JF
- Phone:
- 03300553555
- Email:
- ish@latifs.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window