SALFORD RED DEVILS FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Mission Statment - To provide and promote sport, health and education based activities for the benefit of all regardless of background and ability, with the specific aim of helping the people of our community. Specific current projects include employment courses,Tackle uneployment, N V Q sports leadership, REDS (Rugby Education Development Scheme), Team Read schemes.Red devils Leaning Zone
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
Total income includes £19,995 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Lancashire
- Manchester City
- Salford City
- Trafford
Governance
- 09 May 2007: Standard registration
- 05 March 2025: Funds received from 1182044 MANCHESTER RANGERS COMMUNITY FOUNDATION
- SALFORD CITY REDS FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
George Thomas Tapp | Trustee | 11 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Morley | Trustee | 10 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Paul Andrew King | Trustee | 18 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Michael Burke | Trustee | 18 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
ASIF LATIEF | Trustee | 16 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
MARK PEARSON | Trustee | 18 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
JANICE LOWNDES | Trustee | 18 February 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £244.35k | £251.66k | £291.57k | £287.43k | £214.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £253.25k | £233.75k | £241.20k | £289.24k | £255.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.55k | £53.37k | £71.04k | £27.58k | £20.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 06 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 06 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 10 October 2023 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 10 October 2023 | 10 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 25 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 25 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 17 November 2021 | 48 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 17 November 2021 | 48 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 01 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | 01 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12/06/2006 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 27/06/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/06/2013 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 27/11/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/05/2015
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC GENERALLY AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE INHABITANTS OF SALFORD, GREATER MANCHESTER AND CHESHIRE AND THEIR SURROUNDING AREAS: 3.1 TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF RUGBY AND OTHER SPORTS CAPABLE OF IMPROVING HEALTH ("FACILITIES" IN THIS CLAUSE 3 MEANS LAND, BUILDINGS, EQUIPMENT AND ORGANISING SPORTING ACTIVITIES); 3.2 TO PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR SPORT, RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF SUCH PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED FOR SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; AND 3.3 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAW OF CHARITY.
Area of benefit
SALFORD, GREATER MANCHESTER AND CHESHIRE AND THEIR SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Eccles College
Chatsworth Road
Eccles
MANCHESTER
M30 9FJ
- Phone:
- 01618202739
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window