INTERNATIONAL GOVERNANCE INSTITUTE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotion of good governance in public administration, through networking, publicity, education and research. Key values are integrity, honesty, impartiality, humility, responsibility and transparency. At present, we particularly support initiatives in Africa, but have members in other continents.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Cameroon
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
- Kenya
- Nigeria
- Rwanda
- Somalia
- South Sudan
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 18 February 2008: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL NEW | Chair |
|
|
|||||
SAKWA BULIBA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN KAILEMIA MUKETHA SS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.17k | £7.51k | £6.50k | £7.85k | £7.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.66k | £5.75k | £8.78k | £8.30k | £6.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 27 May 2024 | 112 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 21 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 06 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION (ADOPTED) 08 DECEMBER 2007 AS AMENDED ON 03 DEC 2017
Charitable objects
1)THE PROMOTION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF ETHICAL STANDARDS OF CONDUCT AND COMPLIANCE WITH THE LAW IN PUBLIC ADMINISTRATION BY: A)PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING; AND B)RESEARCHING INTO MATTERS PERTAINING TO GOVERNANCE AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH TO THE PUBLIC 2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO GOVERNANCE AND THE APPLICATION OF ETHICAL STANDARDS IN ACCORDANCE WITH CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES B)REUSE
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED IN PRACTICE NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS AFRICA POSSIBLY EVENTUALLY ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
30 Thornton Road
BELVEDERE
DA17 6DD
- Phone:
- 02083061826
- Email:
- info@igi-integrity.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window