Financial history THE NORTH LONDON COLLEGIATE SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1115843
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £25.41m £25.17m £27.78m £30.10m £35.76m
Total expenditure £23.21m £23.25m £25.09m £26.85m £30.26m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £614.10k £544.58k £677.13k £615.13k £1.80m
Income - Other trading activities £2.91m £2.56m £3.36m £3.86m £5.26m
Income - Charitable activities £21.32m £21.52m £23.12m £24.48m £25.79m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £574.59k £541.30k £625.40k £1.15m £1.76m
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £1.15m
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £2.00k £0 £1.25m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £21.33m £21.58m £22.99m £24.50m £27.18m
Expenditure - Raising funds £234.89k £261.09k £262.60k £716.65k £320.90k
Expenditure - Governance £181.15k £199.36k £254.70k £0 £322.40k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £479.55k £0
Expenditure - Other £1.65m £1.41m £1.84m £1.63m £2.76m