THE NORTH LONDON COLLEGIATE SCHOOL

Charity number: 1115843
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The principal activity of the charity is the provision of an academic education to girls between the ages of 4 and 18 who come from a range of social backgrounds and for whom entry of 4,7,11 and 16 is by competivitve examinations.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Harrow

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 September 2006: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

17 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Gabrielle Lisa Kruger Gower Chair 06 December 2022
None on record
Dr Roma Patel Trustee 25 March 2025
None on record
Stephanie Kate Newman Trustee 25 March 2025
None on record
FIONA JANE BOULTON Trustee 10 July 2024
ST IVES (HASLEMERE) LIMITED
Received: On time
John Sheridan Trustee 10 July 2024
None on record
Munira Boghani-Nathoo Trustee 19 March 2024
None on record
Nina Arleen Kingsmill Moore Trustee 06 December 2022
None on record
Dr Thomas Nicholas Thomas Trustee 06 December 2022
None on record
Ameet Jogia Trustee 06 December 2022
None on record
Andreas Ernst Ferdinand Utermann Trustee 11 October 2022
None on record
Victoria Harding Trustee 06 July 2021
None on record
Emma Judith Sophia Watford Trustee 22 March 2021
None on record
Charlotte Jane Marten Trustee 30 June 2020
THE WESTHAM HOUSE FUND
Received: On time
THE ASSOCIATION OF GOVERNING BODIES OF INDEPENDENT SCHOOLS
Received: On time
Dr Dorothy Toh Trustee 27 March 2019
None on record
Vivien Godfrey Trustee 27 March 2019
None on record
Rowena Herdman-Smith Trustee 27 March 2019
None on record
PETER DAVID NEEDLEMAN Trustee 29 June 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £25.85m £25.41m £25.17m £27.78m £30.10m
Total expenditure £23.34m £23.21m £23.25m £25.09m £26.85m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £633.99k £614.10k £544.58k £677.13k £615.13k
Income - Other trading activities £2.46m £2.91m £2.56m £3.36m £3.86m
Income - Charitable activities £22.12m £21.32m £21.52m £23.12m £24.48m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £627.71k £574.59k £541.30k £625.40k £1.15m
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £100.00k £0 £0 £2.00k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £21.22m £21.33m £21.58m £22.99m £24.50m
Expenditure - Raising funds £276.20k £234.89k £261.09k £262.60k £716.65k
Expenditure - Governance £158.94k £181.15k £199.36k £254.70k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £25.98k £0 £0 £0 £479.55k
Expenditure - Other £1.84m £1.65m £1.41m £1.84m £1.63m

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Own use assets £17.38m £19.98m £21.54m £24.60m £30.47m
Long-term investments £18.23m £18.23m £21.02m £20.57m £19.87m
Other assets £7.72m £6.33m £6.73m £24.87m £20.91m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability -£3.22m -£5.31m -£4.91m £0 £0
Total liabilities £8.82m £7.85m £7.83m £26.20m £24.99m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 04 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 04 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 10 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 10 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 20 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 20 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 18 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 18 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 04 February 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 04 February 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME INCLUDING UNITING DIRECTION DATED 31 AUGUST 2006
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF GIRLS BY THE PROVISION OF A DAY AND/OR BOARDING SCHOOL ("THE SCHOOL") IN OR NEAR THE LONDON BOROUGH OF HARROW AND BY ANCILLARY OR INCIDENTAL EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES AND OTHER ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
THE LONDON BOROUGH OF HARROW
Registration history
  • 29 September 2006 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
NORTH LONDON COLLEGIATE SCHOOL
CANONS
CANONS DRIVE
EDGWARE
HA8 7RJ
Phone:
020 8952 0912