CHICHESTER CHAMBER CONCERTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The presentation of public concerts and recitals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
Total income includes £500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- West Sussex
Governance
- 14 August 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANNA FELICITY HILL | Chair |
|
|
|||||
David Billinge | Trustee | 06 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anne Foxell | Trustee | 06 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
EMMA-JANE WYATT | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Cedric Philip Wake OBE FNI | Trustee | 14 September 2020 |
|
|||||
SALLY MARIANNE CHITTLEBURGH | Trustee | 02 November 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.77k | £13.68k | £27.65k | £28.89k | £24.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.35k | £15.61k | £36.78k | £31.44k | £27.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £500 | £500 | N/A | £500 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 03 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 17 June 2024 | 78 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 17 June 2024 | 78 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 09 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 09 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 25 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 JULY 2006
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE APPRECIATION OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS; AND FOR SUCH GENERAL PURPOSES AS SHALL BE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED BY GI. IN PRACTICE, WEST SUSSEX/HAMPSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
North Walls House
43 North Street
Chichester
West Sussex
PO19 1NF
- Phone:
- 01243773435
- Email:
- PHILIP@WAKEFAMILY.CO.UK
- Website:
-
chichesterchamberconcerts.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window