INTERNATIONAL SCIENTIFIC FORUM ON HOME HYGIENE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity is involved in preserving and protecting good health by raising awareness of the fundamental role that hygiene plays in the home and the community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Germany
- India
Governance
- 21 November 2006: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN ALEXANDER PICKUP | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Dr Lovleen Tina Joshi | Trustee | 01 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Elizabeth Claire Redmond | Trustee | 18 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Professor Lisa Ackerley | Trustee | 19 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
PROF SALLY FLORENCE BLOOMFIELD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50.00k | £45.93k | £56.43k | £32.33k | £70.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.96k | £27.73k | £28.44k | £73.21k | £24.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £35.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 15 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 15 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 24 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 24 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 25 OCTOBER 2006.
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT GOOD HEALTH BY RAISING AWARENESS OF THE FUNDAMENTAL ROLE THAT HYGIENE IN THE HOME AND COMMUNITY PLAYS IN PREVENTING INFECTIOUS DISEASE AND BY PROMOTING UNDERSTANDING OF GOOD HYGIENE BASED ON THE SCIENTIFIC EVIDENCE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE OLD DAIRY COTTAGE
MONTACUTE
TA15 6XL
- Phone:
- 00441935822258
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window