Trustees TRUSTEES OF STONEGRAVE VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 1116369
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Elizabeth Anne Wells Trustee 23 May 2024
None on record
Michael Paul Nirsimloo Trustee 04 May 2023
None on record
Alasdair Scott Thorpe Trustee 04 May 2023
PEAT RIGG CHARITABLE FOUNDATION
Recently registered
Jayne Pullan Trustee 17 March 2019
None on record
John David Cragg-James Trustee 17 December 2013
None on record
Jackie Powell Trustee 08 December 2013
None on record
Howard Raines Trustee
None on record