ASSISTANCE AND CONSULTATION CENTRE (ACC)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
HELP TO ELDERLY, ASYLUM SEEKER, REFUGEES, DOMESTIC VOILNCE, SPORT
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 07 January 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Essex
- Throughout London
- Afghanistan
- Cyprus
- Germany
- Greece
- Iran
- Saudi Arabia
- Sudan
- Sweden
- Turkey
Governance
- 13 November 2006: Standard registration
- IRANIAN ASSISTANCE CONSULTATION CENTRE (IACC) (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Homayun Haghighat | Trustee | 10 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
MEHRDAD KAMALI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JAVAD FOROOZANDEH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 07/01/2020 | 07/01/2021 | 07/01/2022 | 07/01/2023 | 07/01/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 07 January 2024 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 07 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 07 January 2023 | 11 April 2024 | 156 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 07 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 07 January 2022 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 07 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 07 January 2021 | 19 April 2022 | 163 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 07 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 07 January 2020 | 27 March 2021 | 140 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 07 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 16 MAY 2006 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 10 JANUARY 2011.
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS AND THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH AMONG ANY ASYLUM SEEKERS, REFUGEES AND MIGRANTS RESIDING IN THE UK. IN PARTICULAR THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, INFORMATION AND COUNSELLING SERVICES ON EDUCATION, WELFARE BENEFITS, RELIGIOUS WORSHIP, HOUSING, PERSONAL AND FINANCIAL MATTERS, COMMUNITY SERVICES AND HEALTH ISSUES, SPORT CLASSES, ADULT EDUCATION, ANY ACTIVITIES FOR ELDERLY AND CULTURAL ACTIVITIES. THE RELIEF OF DISTRESS AND SUFFERING EXPERIENCED BY WOMEN, IN PARTICULAR, ANY WOMEN WHO HAVE BEEN GRAVELY OR PERSISTENTLY MALTREATED BY THEIR PARTNERS OR BY THE FATHERS OF THEIR CHILDREN. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF ANY COMMUNITY IN THE FIELD OF DOMESTIC VIOLENCE.
Area of benefit
UK
Contact information
- Address:
-
31A NORTH CRESCENT
LONDON
N3 3LL
- Phone:
- 02034416942
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window