Financial history JAMIA AL-KARAM

Charity Number: 1119056
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £600.14k £649.42k £592.63k £573.89k £643.31k
Total expenditure £494.13k £443.19k £525.89k £622.24k £602.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £30.10k £2.15k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £432.61k £461.57k £436.58k £403.72k £469.52k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £167.53k £187.86k £156.05k £170.17k £173.79k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £488.88k £434.19k £519.39k £616.03k £588.03k
Expenditure - Raising funds £5.25k £9.00k £6.50k £6.22k £14.24k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £20.25k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0